EP0240927 - Side-injected metal refining vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1990 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feinstein, Jonathan Jay RFD Nr. 2 Crosby Road North Salem, N.Y., 10560 / US | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104840.1 | 01.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | US19860846801 | 01.04.1986 Original published format: US 846801 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240927 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240927 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/42 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C21C7/0685 (EP,US);
C21C5/30 (KR);
C21C5/42 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/42] | Title | German: | Seitlich blasendes Frischgefäss für Metalle | [1987/42] | English: | Side-injected metal refining vessel | [1987/42] | French: | Récipient à soufflage latéral pour l'affinage de métaux | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5760009 ; | [A]US1517972 (ALEXANDER FAUST PER); | [A]US3703279 (SACCOMANO JOSEPH M, et al); | [A]DE2546275 (ASEA AB); | [A]DE7910204U | [A] - STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 100, no. 16, 11th August 1980, pages 898-900, Düsseldorf; K.-D. UNGER et al.: "Die Zustellung der AOD-Konverter" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 135 (C-115)[1013], 22nd July 1982; & JP - A - 57 60009 (KAWASAKI) 10-04-1982, & JP5760009 A 00000000 |