EP0240954 - Method of making fluxless soldered joints and heat exchangers provided by such method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO A/S Bygdoy Allé 2 0257 Oslo 2 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO A/S Bygdoy Allé 2 N-0257 Oslo 2 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clausen, Edvin List Kogsvn. 10 DK-6270 Tonder / DK | 02 /
Knoll, Richard 1835 S. Atlantic Avenue No. 470 Cocoa Beach Fl. 32932 / US | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104997.9 | 03.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | US19860848113 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: US 848113 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240954 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240954 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23P15/26 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
F28F9/182 (EP);
B23K1/00 (KR);
B23K1/0012 (EP);
B23K1/19 (EP);
B23K35/282 (EP);
F28D1/0476 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1987/42] | B23K1/12, B23P15/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung flussmittelfrei gelöteter Verbindungen und nach diesem Verfahren erzeugte Wärmetauscher | [1987/42] | English: | Method of making fluxless soldered joints and heat exchangers provided by such method | [1987/42] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer des connexions soudées sans flux et échangeur thermique fabriqué d'après ce procédé | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2134833 [ ] (ALCAN INT LTD); | US4207662 [ ] (TAKENAKA HITOSHI [JP]); | US4377024 [ ] (SAPERSTEIN ZALMAN P) |