EP0241838 - Antithrombogenic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | For all designated states SAITAMA DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8-1, Minamisakae-cho Kasukabe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, 1-chome, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | |||
For all designated states SAITAMA DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8-1, Minamisakae-cho Kasukabe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kodama, Makoto c/o Research Institute for Polymers and Textiles 1-1-4, Yatabe-Higashi, Tsukuba, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Tsukasa c/o Research Institute for Polymers and Textiles 1-1-4, Yatabe-Higashi, Tsukuba, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Tsuda, Keishiro c/o Research Institute for Polymers and Textiles 1-1-4, Yatabe-Higashi, Tsukuba, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Okita, Koichi Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Asako, Shigeru Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome, Konohana-ku, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Komamiya, Masaharu c/o Watanabe Pharmaceutical Industry Co., Ltd. 8-1, Minamisakae-cho, Kasukabe, Saitama / JP | 07 /
Oinuma, Hiroshi c/o Watanabe Pharmaceutical Industry Co., Ltd. 8-1, Minamisakae-cho, Kasukabe, Saitama / JP | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/43] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105079.5 | 06.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | JP19860078098 | 07.04.1986 Original published format: JP 7809886 | JP19870073157 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: JP 7315787 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241838 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241838 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241838 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61L33/00 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
A61L33/0029 (EP,US);
A61L33/062 (EP,US);
Y10S128/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L33/0029, C08L89/06 (US,EP);
A61L33/062, C08L89/06 (US,EP);
A61L33/062, C08L89/06, C08L5/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/43] | Title | German: | Antithrombogenisches Material | [1987/43] | English: | Antithrombogenic material | [1987/43] | French: | Matériau antithrombogène | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 03.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XE]EP0230635 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XP]EP0212881 (KOKEN KK [JP]); | [A]GB2033232 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]US4350629 (YANNAS IOANNIS V, et al) |