EP0242734 - Method and device for cooling a resistive magnetic system for nuclear magnetic resonance tomographs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker Analytische Messtechnik GmbH Silberstreifen 76287 Rheinstetten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states Bruker Analytische Messtechnik GmbH Silberstreifen D-76287 Rheinstetten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Wolfgang, Dr. Köslinerstrasse 48a D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | 02 /
Goebel, Klaus Hebelstrasse 1 D-7512 Rheinstetten 3 / DE | [1987/44] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105309.6 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | DE19863613682 | 23.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613682 | [1987/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242734 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242734 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01F5/00, H01F7/20, G01N24/06, G05D23/19 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
G01R33/3804 (EP,US);
H01F27/10 (EP,US);
H01F5/00 (EP,US);
H01F7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kühlen eines resistiven Magnetsystems für Kernspintomographen | [1987/44] | English: | Method and device for cooling a resistive magnetic system for nuclear magnetic resonance tomographs | [1987/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de refroidissement d'un système magnétique résistif pour tomographes à résonance magnétique nucléaire | [1987/44] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/05] | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0122133 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0116367 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US3213929 (MARSHALL HARRY L, et al); | [A]WO8603857 (THOMSON CGR [FR]); | [A]DE3316722 (DIASONICS INC [US]) |