EP0241905 - Circuit board for on-line insertion in computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bier, Gerhard Blumenstrasse 1 D-6742 Herxheim / DE | 02 /
Nilsson, Sven, Dr.rer.nat. Bolzweg 6 D-8024 Deisenhofen / DE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87105498.7 | 14.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | US19860851180 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: US 851180 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241905 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241905 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP);
H05K1/0237 (EP);
H05K1/117 (EP);
H05K1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Schaltungsplatte für On-line-Einfügung in einem Rechnersystem | [1987/43] | English: | Circuit board for on-line insertion in computer system | [1987/43] | French: | Plaquette de circuit pour insertion en ligne dans un système ordinateur | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1990 | New documents discovered [1990/22] | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.05.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1990 | 30.04.1994 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0254456 ; | [Y]US4510553 ; | [A]EP0184657 ; | [A]DE3504560 |