EP0249712 - Cage for a freewheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 1220 91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 Postfach 1220 D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuwirth, Ernst Anna-Hermann-Strasse 48 D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Rabe, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Talblick 6 D-8521 Aurachtal / DE | 03 /
Ritter, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Schützstrasse 7 D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Klug, Horst c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20 91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Klug, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) c/o INA Wälzlager Schaeffler KG Postfach 12 20 D-91063 Herzogenaurach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105632.1 | 15.04.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19863620804 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620804 | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249712 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249712 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/06, F16D41/07 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
F16D41/067 (EP,US);
F16D41/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/52] | Title | German: | Käfig für einen Freilauf | [1987/52] | English: | Cage for a freewheel | [1987/52] | French: | Cage pour une roue libre | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE857458 (VER KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN AG); | [Y]US2793729 (COBB LELAND D); | [Y]FR1565289 ; | [Y]DE1675151 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [X]DE2005894 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [YD]DE2136650 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [Y]US4088211 (DOLLER JOHN S, et al); | [Y]FR2456258 (SKF CIE APPLIC MECANIQUE, et al); | [Y]GB2138082 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG) |