EP0241941 - Method and apparatus for establishing sorption isotherms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALEXANDER, Martin Dr. Wilhelm-Kuhnert-Str. 24 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105720.4 | 16.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863612817 | 16.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612817 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241941 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241941 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/00, G01N30/26 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
G01N30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/43] | G01N30/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung von Sorptionsisothermen | [1987/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for establishing sorption isotherms | [1987/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'établissement d'isothermes de sorptions | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/17] | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4149402 | [A] - INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY, Band 15, Nr. 1, Januar-Februar 1985Seiten 37-38,40-42,44,46; J.E. SHIELDS et al.: "A high throughput automated instrument for adsorption-desorption isotherms" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, Band 71, Nr. 2, 6. September 1972Seiten 173-192; R.G. GERRITSE et al.: "A new method for the determination of simultaneous adsorption isotherms in gas-solid systems by means of gas chromatography" |