EP0242821 - Method and apparatus for supporting cathode-ray tube panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itiki, Hidetoshi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Kozasa, Yoshihisa c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1987/44] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105726.1 | 16.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | JP19860089498 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8949886 | [1987/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242821 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242821 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242821 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/22 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
H01J9/223 (EP,US);
H01J9/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Tragen eines Kathodenstrahlrohrpaneels | [1987/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for supporting cathode-ray tube panel | [1987/44] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour maintenir un panneau de tube à rayon cathodique | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4317427 (TURNER CLARENCE C) |