EP0261303 - Pressure-charged fluidized-bed combustion apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Werke Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Werke Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bülbring, Jürgen Hagenstrasse 303 A D-5820 Gevelsberg / DE | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Müller, Jürgen Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Müller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87105781.6 | 18.04.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | DE19863628675 | 23.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3628675 | [1988/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261303 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261303 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23C11/02, F23L15/00 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
F23L15/00 (EP,US);
F23C10/16 (EP,US);
F23C10/18 (EP,US);
F23C2900/99006 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Druckaufgeladene Wirbelschichtfeuerung | [1988/13] | English: | Pressure-charged fluidized-bed combustion apparatus | [1988/13] | French: | Appareil de combustion en lit fluidisé chargé sous pression | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2023268 (WORSLEY & CO LTD G P); | [A]GB2111846 (CURTISS WRIGHT CORP); | [A]EP0164692 (ASEA STAL AB [SE]); | [A]DE3604572 (ASEA STAL AB [SE]) | Examination | - Technische Mitteilungen, 77, 1984, Heft 617, Seten 304-306 |