EP0244689 - Homogenous carbon bricks and process for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1990 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Hans Provinzialstrasse 32 D-5411 Urbar / DE | 02 /
Ernst, Josef Waldstrasse 20 D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | [1987/46] | Application number, filing date | 87105789.9 | 18.04.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | DE19863614111 | 25.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3614111 | [1987/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0244689 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0244689 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/52 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
C04B35/532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/46] | Title | German: | Homogene Kohlenstoff-Steine und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1987/46] | English: | Homogenous carbon bricks and process for their manufacture | [1987/46] | French: | Briques de carbone homogènes et procédé de leur fabrication | [1987/46] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/40] | 11.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.03.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0186611 ; | [X]US3089125 ; | [X]DE2222705 ; | [X]US4360485 ; | [A]EP0021409 ; | [AD]GB647440 |