EP0257192 - Method of treating radioactive ion-exchange resins by oxidative decomposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morioka, Takayuki FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Motoyama, Nobuyuki FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hoshikawa, Hiroshi FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Takeo FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Sizuo FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Ishikawa, Tuyoshi FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
Uede, Toshio FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/09] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106105.7 | 28.04.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | JP19860194192 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19419286 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257192 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257192 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/00 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
G21F9/14 (EP,US);
Y10S210/908 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beseitigung radioaktiver Ionenaustauscherharze mittels oxidierender Zerlegung | [1988/09] | English: | Method of treating radioactive ion-exchange resins by oxidative decomposition | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé d'élimination d'une résine échangeuse d'ions par décomposition oxydante | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT379250B [ ] (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF [AT], et al); | AT379251B [ ] (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF [AT], et al); | GB1574795 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT A L EN ATOMIQU); | US4235738 [ ] (JAKUSCH HEINZ [AT], et al); | WO8500922 [ ] (STUDSVIK ENERGITEKNIK AB [SE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unxamined Applications, C Field, Vol. 6, No. 57 (C-98 (955), April 14, 1982 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 104 C 98 * Kokai-No. 57-1 446 (A) (Nippon Genshiryoku Kenkyusho) * | Examination | JPS5944700 |