EP0256214 - Process for separation of water-insoluble distillates from water vapour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/08] | Process for separation of water-insolouble distillates from water vapour | ||
[1991/24] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Helenenstrasse 149 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Helenenstrasse 149 D-45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states Extraktionstechnik Gesellschaft für Anlagenbau m.b.H. Humboldtstrasse 56 Postfach 76 03 69 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Klaus Richterstrasse 13 D-2000 Hamburg 76 / DE | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/39] |
Former [1988/08] | Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Parkstrasse 10 Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106435.8 | 04.05.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | DE19863627477 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627477 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256214 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256214 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256214 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0256214 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
B01D5/0027 (EP,US);
B01D3/00 (EP,US);
B01D5/0048 (EP,US);
B01D5/0087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/08] | B01D3/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1988/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abtrennen von wasserunlöslichen Destillaten aus Wasserdampfbrüden | [1988/08] | English: | Process for separation of water-insoluble distillates from water vapour | [1991/24] | French: | Procédé pour séparer des distillats insolubles dans l'eau de la vapeur d'eau | [1988/08] |
Former [1988/08] | Process for separation of water-insolouble distillates from water vapour | Examination procedure | 24.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.1992
02.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE GEA Wiegand GmbH Einsteinstrasse 9-15 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Fincke, Karl Theodor Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.1992
02.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE GEA Wiegand GmbH Einsteinstrasse 9-15 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 16.04.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.08.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.08.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.03.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.11.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.05.1993 | Appeal received No. T0474/93 | 21.05.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.11.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 09.11.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4188290 (GRAHAM JAMES J [US], et al); | [A]US2794515 (ADOLF SCHMALENBACH, et al); | [AP]US4613410 (RIVERS JR JACOB B [US]) |