EP0248222 - Cooling tubes, and process and device for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO A/S Bygdoy Allé 2 0257 Oslo 2 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO A/S Bygdoy Allé 2 N-0257 Oslo 2 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremnitz, Harald Beim Kreuz 29 A-6700 Bludenz / AT | 02 /
Obersberger, Martin Nr. 354 A-6712 Thüringen / AT | 03 /
Weit, Heinz Zürcherstrasse 11 A-6700 Bludenz / AT | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106508.2 | 05.05.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | DE19863615300 | 06.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3615300 | [1987/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248222 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248222 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/10, F28F1/16, F28F1/02, B21C23/10 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28F3/044 (EP);
F28F3/048 (EP);
F28D2021/0049 (EP);
F28D2021/0082 (EP);
F28F2255/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | F28F1/10, F28F1/16, F28F1/02, B21D53/06 | ||
Former IPC [1987/50] | F28F9/10, F28F1/16, F28F1/02, B21D53/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Kühlrohre, sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu deren Herstellung | [1987/50] | English: | Cooling tubes, and process and device for their manufacture | [1987/50] | French: | Tubes de refroidissement, ainsi que le procédé et l'appareil pour leur fabrication | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/11] | 24.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3596495 ; | [Y]GB2090651 ; | [Y]DE3406122 ; | [Y]US3635614 ; | [Y]DE8530313U ; | [Y]GB2159265 ; | [A]FR1488032 ; | [A]JPS58119842 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 227 (M-248)[1372]7. Oktober 1983; & JP-A-58 119 842 (INA SEITOU K.K.) 16-07-1983 |