EP0245839 - Flexible feed pyrolysis process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The M. W. Kellogg Company Three Greenway Plaza East Houston Texas 77046-0395 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states The M. W. Kellogg Company Three Greenway Plaza East Houston Texas 77046-0395 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackemesser, Larry G. 10322 Hondo Hill Road Houston Texas 77064 / US | 02 /
Lankford, Bradley L. 2152 Lexington Houston Texas 77098 / US | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87106867.2 | 12.05.1987 | [1987/47] | Priority number, date | US19860861963 | 12.05.1986 Original published format: US 861963 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245839 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245839 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/14 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
C10G9/14 (EP,US);
C10G9/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/47] | Title | German: | Pyrolyseverfahren für flexible Einsätze | [1987/47] | English: | Flexible feed pyrolysis process | [1987/47] | French: | Procédé de pyrolyse pour charges flexibles | [1990/35] |
Former [1987/47] | Procédé de pyrolyne pour charges flexibles | Examination procedure | 28.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4479869 (PETTERSON WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [AP]FR2588564 (VYZK USTAV CHEM ZARIZENI [CS]); | [A]FR1499590 (WELLMAN INCANDESCENT FURN CO) |