EP0246560 - Manufacturing method of prestressed steel girder and achieved girders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARBED S.A. Avenue de la Liberté 19 L-2930 Luxembourg / LU | For all designated states A.I.T.N. S.P.R.L. 14, rue de Paris B-4000 LIEGE / BE | [1987/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schleich, Jean-Baptiste 3, rue Mathias Weistroffer L-1898 Kockelscheuer / LU | 02 /
Baus, Raymond 111, rue de Hesbaye B-4000 Liege / BE | 03 /
Chapeau, Willy 1, rue Chopin B-4208 Seraing / BE | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul, et al Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Leitz, Paul, et al Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1987/48] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87106972.0 | 14.05.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | LU19860086442 | 23.05.1986 Original published format: LU 86442 | [1987/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246560 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246560 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04C3/10, B21D47/01 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
E04C3/10 (EP);
E04C2003/0413 (EP);
E04C2003/0434 (EP);
E04C2003/0452 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/48] | E04C3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für vorgespannte Stahlträger und fertiggestellte Träger | [1987/48] | English: | Manufacturing method of prestressed steel girder and achieved girders | [1987/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de poutrelles précontraintes en acier et poutrelles obtenues | [1987/48] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/21] | 29.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT139335B ; | [X]DD26379 ; | [A]GB680022 ; | [A]GB504933 ; | [A]DE1527358 | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED |