EP0247469 - Vulcanising envelope for repairing and recapping tyres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1990 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmermbeck, Dieter Suitbertweg 2B D-4630 Bochum-Harpen / DE | For all designated states Schmermbeck, Christine Suitbertweg 2B D-4630 Bochum-Harpen / DE | [1987/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Finkener und Ernesti Patentanwälte Heinrich-König-Strasse 119 44795 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Finkener und Ernesti Patentanwälte Heinrich-König-Strasse 119 D-44795 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/49] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107140.3 | 18.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | DE19863618251 | 30.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3618251 | [1987/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247469 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247469 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/56 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B29D30/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Vulkanisationshülle zum Reparieren und Runderneuern von Fahrzeugreifen | [1987/49] | English: | Vulcanising envelope for repairing and recapping tyres | [1987/49] | French: | Enveloppe de vulcanisation pour la séparation et le rechapage de pneumatiques | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.07.1989 | FR | 19.07.1989 | GB | 19.07.1989 | GR | 19.07.1989 | IT | 19.07.1989 | NL | 19.07.1989 | ES | 30.10.1989 | SE | 01.02.1990 | [2004/03] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 19.07.1989 | |
FR | 19.07.1989 | ||
GB | 19.07.1989 | ||
GR | 19.07.1989 | ||
IT | 19.07.1989 | ||
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.02.1990 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 19.07.1989 | |
GB | 19.07.1989 | ||
GR | 19.07.1989 | ||
IT | 19.07.1989 | ||
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.02.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.07.1989 | |
GB | 19.07.1989 | ||
IT | 19.07.1989 | ||
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.02.1990 | ||
Former [1996/18] | BE | 19.07.1989 | |
GB | 19.07.1989 | ||
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
SE | 01.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | BE | 19.07.1989 | |
GB | 19.07.1989 | ||
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 19.07.1989 | |
NL | 19.07.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 19.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3236709 (JAMES CARVER ROY); | [A]US3884740 (SCHELKMANN WILHELM); | [A]US4175991 (HARRELSON ALBERT A JR [US]); | [A]US4309234 (WITHERSPOON PHILLIP L); | [A]DE3420125 (PETER BTR GUMMIWERKE AG [DE]) |