EP0247503 - Method of driving a solid state imager device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/49] | Solid state imager device | ||
[1995/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Michio c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Terakawa, Hiroshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kumesawa, Tetsuro c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Fukusyo, Takashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107292.2 | 19.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | JP19860114375 | 19.05.1986 Original published format: JP 11437586 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247503 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247503 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247503 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
H01L27/14831 (EP,US);
H01L27/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/49] | Title | German: | Steuerverfahren für einen Festkörperbildgeber | [1995/09] | English: | Method of driving a solid state imager device | [1995/09] | French: | Méthode pour faire fonctionner un dispositif capteur d'images à état solide | [1995/09] |
Former [1987/49] | Festkörperbildaufnahmeanordnung | ||
Former [1987/49] | Solid state imager device | ||
Former [1987/49] | Dispositif de capteur d'images à état solide | Examination procedure | 27.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0173542 (SHARP KK [JP]) |