EP0248272 - Polarized electromagnet device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Haruo c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. No. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Hirota, Takato c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. No. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/50] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107299.7 | 19.05.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | JP19860127655 | 02.06.1986 Original published format: JP 12765586 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248272 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248272 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248272 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H51/22 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
H01F7/1615 (EP,US);
H01H51/2209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/50] | Title | German: | Polarisierte elektromagnetische Vorrichtung | [1987/50] | English: | Polarized electromagnet device | [1987/50] | French: | Dispositif électromagnétique polarisé | [1987/50] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 19.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0078324 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0186393 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0146421 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) | [X] - 33rd Annual National Relay Conference at Oklahoma State University 23 April 1985, Stillwater, Oklahoma page 140 - 147; H. Matsushita K. Kawasaki: "Development of high sensitive power relay with polarized magnetic system" |