EP0293499 - Implantable multi-pole coaxial lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For:SE
Siemens-Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna 1 / SE | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1988/49] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fahlström, Ulf, Dipl.-Ing. Hagagatan 1 S-113 48 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Lekholm, Anders, Dr. Gnejesvägen 4 S-161 39 Bromma / SE | 03 /
Groothoff, Hermann Mozartstrasse 23 D-2908 Friesoythe / DE | [1988/49] | Application number, filing date | 87107895.2 | 01.06.1987 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293499 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293499 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Implantierbare vielpolige koaxiale Leitung | [1988/49] | English: | Implantable multi-pole coaxial lead | [1988/49] | French: | Conducteur coaxial multipolaire implantable | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.09.1993 | [1994/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162178 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH]); | [A]CH656313 (STRAUMANN INST AG) | Examination | EP0292596 |