EP0248380 - Apparatus for controlling a variable air volume unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1990 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Service Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states Johnson Service Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heckenbach, Terry A. 57228 County Road 33 Middlebury Indiana 46540 / US | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87107897.8 | 01.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | US19860869271 | 02.06.1986 Original published format: US 869271 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248380 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248380 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, F24F11/00 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
G05D23/1917 (EP);
F24F11/74 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24F11/84 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F2003/0446 (EP);
F24F2110/10 (EP);
F24F2110/20 (EP);
F24F2110/40 (EP);
F24F2221/54 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Steuerungsvorrichtung einer Einheit mit veränderbarer Luftmenge | [1987/50] | English: | Apparatus for controlling a variable air volume unit | [1987/50] | French: | Appareil de commande d'une unité à volume d'air variable | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8400624 (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]); | [X]WO8500064 (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]); | [Y]EP0146488 (CARRIER CORP [US]); | [AD]US4540118 (LORTIE RICHARD P [US], et al); | [AD]US4543796 (HAN DOYOUNG [US], et al) |