EP0248411 - Fuel pressure regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/50] | Fluid pressure regulator | ||
[1992/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asayama, Yoshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Works No. 840 Chiyoda-cho Himeji Hyogo / JP | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108013.1 | 03.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | JP19860128610 | 03.06.1986 Original published format: JP 12861086 | JP19860158538 | 04.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15853886 | JP19860233579 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: JP 23357986 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248411 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248411 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248411 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02M69/00 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
G05D16/185 (EP,US);
F02M69/00 (KR);
F02D41/065 (EP,US);
F02M51/02 (EP,US);
F02M69/20 (EP,US);
F02M69/54 (EP,US);
F02D2250/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/50] | Title | German: | Druckregler für Kraftstoff | [1992/13] | English: | Fuel pressure regulator | [1992/13] | French: | Régulateur de pression pour carburant | [1992/13] |
Former [1987/50] | Druckregler für Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [1987/50] | Fluid pressure regulator | ||
Former [1987/50] | Régulateur de pression pour les fluides | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Request for further processing for: | 17.10.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1563563 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [X]GB1469551 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB1486433 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB1535950 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB1569900 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB2011533 (AUDI AG) |