EP0250923 - Adjustment mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balcke-Dürr AG Homberger Strasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witte, Gerd Wingertstrasse 33 D-6710 Frankenthal 1 / DE | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/31] |
Former [1988/01] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108143.6 | 05.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863620879 | 21.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620879 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250923 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250923 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F03B3/14 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
F04D29/362 (EP,US);
F01D7/00 (EP,US);
F05D2260/74 (EP,US);
F05D2260/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verstelleinrichtung | [1988/01] | English: | Adjustment mechanism | [1988/01] | French: | Dispositif d'ajustage | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 02.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/27] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2525285 (DURAND ENGRENAGES [FR]); | [Y]US2738045 (MERGEN JOSEPH M, et al); | [A]US2423400 (NICHOLS HARRY J); | [A]US1964102 (RALPH WISHON) |