EP0249915 - Production of light olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | ||
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Steven William 900 Glendale South Charleston West Virginia 25303 / US | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr. Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87108554.4 | 13.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | US19860874477 | 16.06.1986 Original published format: US 874477 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249915 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249915 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C11/02, // B01J29/02 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
C07C1/00 (EP,US);
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
C07C2529/83 (EP,US);
C07C2529/85 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US);
Y02P30/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/00, C07C11/02 (EP,US);
C07C1/20, C07C11/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Leichtolefinen | [1987/52] | English: | Production of light olefins | [1987/52] | French: | Production d'oléfines légères | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.11.1991 | BE | 27.11.1991 | CH | 27.11.1991 | GR | 27.11.1991 | LI | 27.11.1991 | ES | 10.03.1992 | LU | 30.06.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.11.1991 | |
BE | 27.11.1991 | ||
CH | 27.11.1991 | ||
GR | 27.11.1991 | ||
LI | 27.11.1991 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 27.11.1991 | |
BE | 27.11.1991 | ||
CH | 27.11.1991 | ||
LI | 27.11.1991 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 27.11.1991 | |
BE | 27.11.1991 | ||
CH | 27.11.1991 | ||
LI | 27.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 27.11.1991 | |
CH | 27.11.1991 | ||
LI | 27.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/27] | CH | 27.11.1991 | |
LI | 27.11.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | US4499327 [ ] (KAISER STEVEN W [US]); | WO8604577 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |