EP0252351 - 5-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkylbenzenes and hair dyes containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clausen, Thomas, Dr. Ernst-Pasqué-Strasse 35 A D-6146 Alsbach / DE | 02 /
Konrad, Eugen Mecklenburger Strasse 101 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1988/02] | Application number, filing date | 87108854.8 | 20.06.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | DE19863622784 | 07.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3622784 | [1988/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252351 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252351 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/84, A61K7/13 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/411 (EP,US);
C07C205/37 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/02] | C07C93/14, A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Neue 5-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkylbenzole sowie Haarfärbemittel mit 5-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkyl-benzolen | [1990/37] | English: | 5-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkylbenzenes and hair dyes containing same | [1988/02] | French: | Alcoylbenzènes 5-alcoxy-2,4-diamino et teintures pour les cheveux les contenant | [1988/02] |
Former [1988/02] | Neue 2-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkylbenzole sowie Haarfärbemittel mit 5-Alkoxy-2,4-diamino-alkyl-benzolen | Examination procedure | 21.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1619614 ; | [A]US2381877 (SCOTT CARPENTER MARION); | [A]GB1344796 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2628999 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]FR2542193 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [AD]GB2163154 (WELLA AG) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 77, Nr. 5, 31. Juli 1972, Seite 450, Zusammenfassungsnr. 33688y, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.F. CORBETT "Benzoquinone imines. X. Mechanism and kinetics of the reactions of p-benzoquinone diimine and p-benzoquinone monoimine with C-methoxy-m-diamines and p-methoxy- and p-chlorophenols", & J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 2 1972, (8), 999-1005 |