EP0276359 - Process and apparatus for applying edging material to plate-like elements, for example furniture parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMA-Norte Maschinenfabriken Klessmann GmbH & Co. Am Ölbach 19 D-33334 Gütersloh / DE | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riesmeier, Wilhelm Franz-Liszt Strasse 5 D-4990 Lübbecke 1 / DE | 02 /
Rose, Martin Heuerhofstrasse 8 D-4992 Espelkamp / DE | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Elbertzhagen, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Elbertzhagen, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109185.6 | 26.06.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | DE19873702155 | 26.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3702155 | [1988/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276359 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276359 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B27D5/00, B29C63/00, // B29L31:44 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B26D5/12 (EP,US);
B26F1/12 (EP,US);
B27D5/003 (EP,US);
B29C63/0026 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von Kantenmaterial an plattenförmige Werkstücke, wie Möbelelemente | [1988/31] | English: | Process and apparatus for applying edging material to plate-like elements, for example furniture parts | [1988/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'application d'une matière de bordure sur des éléments en forme de plaque, par exemple éléments pour meubles | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/32] | 06.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3635114 (FRITZ ALTON L); | [A]CH342442 (LANGENEGGER ADOLF [CH]); | [A]US3610189 ; | [A]US3540118 (HUGHES THOMAS H) |