EP0253179 - A-acylamino aminoalkyl phophonate angiotensin converting enzyme inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karanewsky, Donald Steven 8 Charred Oak Lane East Windsor New Jersey / US | 02 /
Petrillo, Edward William, Jr. 5 Walking Purchase Drive Pennington New Jersey / US | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | [2008/38] |
Former [1988/03] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87109254.0 | 26.06.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | US19860885560 | 14.07.1986 Original published format: US 885560 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253179 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253179 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253179 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/547, C07F9/40, A61K31/66 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
C07F9/65586 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F9/4075 (EP);
C07F9/572 (EP);
C07F9/5728 (EP);
C07F9/62 (EP);
C07F9/65031 (EP);
C07F9/653 (EP);
C07F9/6539 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/03] | C07F9/65, C07F9/40, A61K31/66 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Alpha-acylamino-aminoalkyl-phosphonat-Inhibitor des Angiotensin umwandelnden Enzyms | [1988/03] | English: | A-acylamino aminoalkyl phophonate angiotensin converting enzyme inhibitors | [1988/03] | French: | Alpha-acylamino aminoalkyl phosphonate inhibiteur d'enzymes convertissant l'angiotensine | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0097534 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [A]EP0083172 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) |