EP0254081 - Method of detecting specific protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoneda, Yuko 1-16 Akebono-cho Toyama-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states Yoneda, Yuko 1-16 Akebono-cho Toyama-shi Toyama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109352.2 | 29.06.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860153707 | 30.06.1986 Original published format: JP 15370786 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254081 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254081 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/76, G01N33/577 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/54366 (EP);
G01N33/54393 (EP);
G01N33/553 (EP);
G01N33/576 (EP);
G01N33/577 (EP);
G01N33/585 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Feststellung spezifisches Protein | [1988/04] | English: | Method of detecting specific protein | [1988/04] | French: | Procédé pour détecter une protéine spécifique | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 29.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/23] | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8502258 ; | [Y]US4313734 ; | [Y]EP0158746 ; | [Y]DE2208269 ; | [A]EP0158973 ; | [A]GB2095831 ; | [A]WO8404598 |