EP0252452 - Separation of L+R from L-R in BTSC system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zink, Scott Eugene 13550 N.W. Laidlaw Road Portland Oregon 97229 / US | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109625.1 | 03.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | US19860882753 | 07.07.1986 Original published format: US 882753 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252452 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252452 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252452 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/60, H03D1/22 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
H04N5/607 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/02] | H04N5/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/02] | Title | German: | Signaltrennung l+r von l-r im BTSC-System | [1988/02] | English: | Separation of L+R from L-R in BTSC system | [1988/02] | French: | Séparation g+d de g-d dans un système BTSC | [1988/02] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.11.1993 | NL | 10.11.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/03] | NL | 10.11.1993 | |
FR | 01.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 10.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4502148 (ISHIDA KOHJI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP60128732 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol.9,no. 288 (E-358)(2011), 15 November 1985; & JP-A-60128732 (NIPPON DENKI) 09.07.1985, & JP60128732 A 19851115 |