EP0257250 - Prefabricated, transportable, modular dwelling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nierle, Pierre 35, Avenue Eugène Lance CH-1212 Grand-Lancy / CH | [1988/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | Application number, filing date | 87109659.0 | 04.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | CH19860003459 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: CH 345986 | [1988/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257250 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257250 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/343, E04H1/02 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
E04B1/34331 (EP,US);
E04H1/02 (EP,US);
Y10S52/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Vorgefertigtes, transportables und modulares Wohnhaus | [1988/09] | English: | Prefabricated, transportable, modular dwelling | [1988/09] | French: | Habitation préfabriquée transportable modulaire | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3230673 (GERSIN ROBERT P); | [A]DE1958809 (SIEVERS BURGHARD DIPL ING); | [A]FR2414104 (GREMILLET GERALD [FR]); | [A]FR2426784 (GERSSEN PETER [NL]); | [A]US4480414 (TSCHUDY DONALD B [US], et al) |