EP0253261 - Air spring suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317 / US | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geno, Wayne H. 106 Royal Pine Lane Cicero Indiana 46034 / US | 02 /
Weitzenhof, David A. 1590 Orchard Drive Akron Ohio 44210 / US | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | von Raffay, Vincenz, et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109705.1 | 06.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | US19860885124 | 14.07.1986 Original published format: US 885124 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253261 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253261 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253261 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60G15/12, F16F9/08 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
B60G13/10 (KR);
B60G15/14 (EP,US);
F16C27/063 (EP,US);
F16F9/05 (EP,US);
F16F9/084 (EP,US);
F16F9/54 (EP,US);
B60G2202/312 (EP,US);
B60G2202/314 (EP,US);
B60G2204/128 (EP,US);
B60G2204/41 (EP,US);
B60G2204/418 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4502 (EP,US);
F16C2326/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/03] | Title | German: | Luftfederaufhängungssystem | [1988/03] | English: | Air spring suspension system | [1988/03] | French: | Système de suspension à ressort pneumatique | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57110517 ; | [XP]EP0210553 (AUDI AG [DE], et al); | [AP]EP0225271 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [AP]DE3631610 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]US4332397 (STEGER CHARLES B); | [A]CH409533 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 204 (M-164)[1082], 15th October 1982; & JP-A-57 110 517 (FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.) 09-07-1982, & JP57110517 A 00000000 |