EP0298139 - Shoe for cyclists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOOK S.A. Rue de la Pique 58004 Nevers cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states Look S.A. Rue de la Pique F-58004 Nevers cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bezin, Michel Apptm. 49, Entrée C 42bis Boulevard Victor Hugo F-58000 Nevers / FR | 02 /
Boisot, Yves 1 rue Lamartine F-58640 Varennes-Vauzelles / FR | 03 /
Harsányi, Otto Untere Burghalde 27 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/02] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109717.6 | 06.07.1987 | [1989/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298139 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298139 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/14 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
A43B5/14 (EP,US);
Y10T74/217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Radfahrerschuh | [1989/02] | English: | Shoe for cyclists | [1989/02] | French: | Chaussure pour cyclistes | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.09.1991 | SE | 25.09.1991 | [1992/26] |
Former [1992/20] | SE | 25.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2240102 (LIMBERGER HEINZ); | [A]US4188737 (HAVER SANFORD A [US]); | [A]US4662090 (SOLANO MIKE L [US]) |