EP0252478 - Co-base alloy sputter target and process of manufacturing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Hagizono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500, Hagizono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA also trading as ULVAC CORPORATION 2500, Hagizono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kyuzo No. 672-20, Yachimata Ho Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Ota, Yoshifumi No. 129, Yachimata Ni Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Taiki No. 1-1-5-502, Hashikadai Narita-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Ishikawa, Michio No. 106-352, Yachimata Ni Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Tani, Noriaki Umenosato-Ryo No. 617-2, Asahi Aza Umenosato Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Higuchi, Yasushi Umenosato-Ryo No. 617-2, Asahi Aza Umenosato Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1993/40] |
Former [1988/02] | 01 /
Nakamura, Kyuzo No. 672-20, Yachimata Ho Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ota, Yoshifumi No. 129, Yachimata Ni Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yamada, Taiki No. 1-1-5-502, Hashikadai Narita-shi Chiba-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Ishikawa, Michio No. 106-352, Yachimata Ni Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Tani, Noriaki Umenosato-Ryo No. 617-2, Asahi Aza Umenosato Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | |||
06 /
HIguchi, Yasushi Umenosato-Ryo No. 617-2, Asahi Aza Umenosato Yachimata-machi Inba-gun Chiba-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109731.7 | 06.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | JP19860158755 | 08.07.1986 Original published format: JP 15875586 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252478 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252478 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252478 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, C22F1/10 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/02] | Title | German: | Target aus Kobalt-Basis für Kathodenzerstäubung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/02] | English: | Co-base alloy sputter target and process of manufacturing thereof | [1988/02] | French: | Cible à base de cobalt pour dépôt par pulvérisation et procédé de sa fabrication | [1988/02] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.06.1994
Leybold Materials GmbH Wilhelm-Rohn-Str. 25 D-63405 Hanau am Main / DE | [1994/31] | 22.09.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/34] | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.07.1995 | BE | 31.07.1995 | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.07.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | GB | 06.07.1995 | |
BE | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | GB | 06.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60006219 ; | [A]EP0054269 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]US4414087 (MECKEL BENJAMIN B [US]); | [A]US3494807 (STUART ROBERT E, et al) | [A] - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR METALLKUNDE, vol. 75, no. 11, November 1984, pages 847-854, Stuttgart, DE; J.A. THORNTON: "Hollow cathode magnetron sputtering of metallurgical coatings" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 121 (M-382)[1844], 25th May 1985; & JP-A-60 006 219 (MITSUI KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 12-01-1985, & JP60006219 A 00000000 | Examination | US3626570 |