EP0254128 - Method and arrangement for charge-free examination of a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plies, Erich, Dr. Deisenhofener Strasse 79 c D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87109817.4 | 07.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863625198 | 25.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3625198 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254128 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254128 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/225, H01J37/02 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G01N23/2251 (EP);
H01J37/026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/04] | G01N23/225 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur aufladungsfreien Untersuchung einer Probe | [1988/04] | English: | Method and arrangement for charge-free examination of a sample | [1988/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour examiner un échantillon sans charge | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/30] | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2173436 ; | [A]DE3332248 ; | [A]US4249077 ; | [A]EP0114765 | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 27, nr. 11, April 1985, Seiten 5682-5697, New YorkUSA; "Wafer decharging during electron-beam exposure" | [A] - PHYSICAL REVIEW B. CONDENSED MATTER, Band 33, nr 8, April 1986, Seiten 5682-5697, New YorkUSA; M. LIEHR et al.: "Characterization of insulators by high-resolution electron-energy-loss spectroscopy: Application of a surface-potential stabilization technique" |