EP0254924 - Drawing material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Herderstrasse 21 D-6203 Hochheim/M. / DE | 02 /
Keiper, Roman Rathausstrasse 92 D-6200 Wiesbadeb-Biebrich / DE | [1993/35] |
Former [1988/05] | 01 /
Lutz, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Herderstrasse 21 D-6203 Hochheim/M / DE | ||
02 /
Keiper, Roman Rathausstrasse 92 D-6200 Wiesbadeb-Biebrich / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109857.0 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | DE19863623984 | 16.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3623984 | [1988/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254924 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254924 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254924 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D167/02, B44D3/18, B05D5/04 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
B05D5/04 (EP,US);
B05D7/04 (EP,US);
B44D3/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/34922 (EP,US);
C09D133/04 (EP,US);
C08L61/32 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/34922, C08L33/04 (EP,US);
C09D133/04, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1988/05] | C09D3/66, B44D3/18, B05D5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/05] | Title | German: | Zeichenmaterial | [1988/05] | English: | Drawing material | [1988/05] | French: | Utensile à dessiner | [1993/35] |
Former [1988/05] | Ustensile à dessiner | Examination procedure | 06.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58108259 ; | [Y]FR2000975 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]FR2246392 (OCE VAN DER GRINTEN NV [NL]); | [Y]DE2553354 (ALKOR GMBH); | [A]FR2370775 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [X]US4369283 (ALTSCHULER LILI W); | [AD]EP0119464 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 209 (C-186)[1354], 14. September 1983; & JP-A-58 108 259 (NIHON KAGAKU TORIYOU K.K.) 28-06-1983, & JP58108259 A 00000000 |