EP0260397 - Data display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo (Albstadt) GmbH Unter dem Malesfelsen 34 72458 Albstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo (Albstadt) GmbH Unter dem Malesfelsen 34 D-72458 Albstadt / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo (Albstadt) GmbH Gartenstrasse 86 D-7470 Albstadt-Ebingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermann, Bernhard Germanenweg 2 D-7464 Schömberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Mürdter, Herbert Rossbergstrasse 63 D-7470 Albstadt 2-Tailfingen / DE | 03 /
Ehresmann, Walter Schlossstrasse 16 D-7470 Albstadt 2-Tailfingen / DE | 04 /
Kammerer, Manfred Wilhelm-Keller-Strasse 44 D-7470 Albstadt 1-Ebingen / DE | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87109867.9 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | DE19863627394 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627394 | [1988/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260397 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260397 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260397 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/04 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
G01G23/36 (EP,US);
G09G3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Sichtdarstellung von Informationsinhalten | [1988/12] | English: | Data display device | [1988/12] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage de données | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4341197 (BUTTS ORVILLE R); | [A]LU84046 (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG [CH]); | [A]US4351033 (UCHIMURA MITSUO, et al); | [A]EP0092915 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0153738 (SAUTER AUGUST GMBH [DE]) |