EP0259567 - Dosing equipment for additional material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bollschweiler, Reinhold Lückhoffstrasse 8 D-1000 Berlin 38 / DE | [1988/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Rudi Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer Am Dickelsbach 8 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Beyer, Rudi Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rudi Beyer Am Dickelsbach 8 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110039.2 | 11.07.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | DE19863628146 | 19.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3628146 | [1988/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0259567 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0259567 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/10, B01F15/04 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
B29C48/29 (EP);
B01F35/833 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP);
B29K2105/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/11] | Title | German: | Dosiergerät zum Dosieren von Zuschlagstoffen | [1988/11] | English: | Dosing equipment for additional material | [1988/11] | French: | Dispositif de dosage pour matériel additionnel | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1987 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 26.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2059870 (COHEN RAYMOND); | [AD]GB1565812 (PLASTORE SA); | [X]DE3417316 (KALWAR KLAUS) |