EP0254178 - Orientated polymeric material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorsch, Dieter, Dr. Reuterallee 24 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Eidenschink, Rudolf, Dr. Konrad Adenauer Strasse 1 D-6109 Mühltal 1 / DE | 03 /
Herz, Claus P., Dr. Berghalde 20 D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87110120.0 | 14.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863624898 | 23.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624898 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254178 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254178 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G85/00, G02F1/35 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/3615 (EP,US);
C08F2/46 (KR);
C08G85/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | Orientierte Polymermaterialien | [1988/04] | English: | Orientated polymeric material | [1988/04] | French: | Matériau polymère orienté | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/17] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0021695 (UNIVERSITY PATENTS INC [US]) |