EP0253397 - Shape recognition method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/03] | Shape recognition apparatus | ||
[1993/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hideshi 1-22, Kosakai-cho 3-chome Yao City, 581 / JP | 02 /
Okumura, Kazumasa 32-8-A311, Gokasho-Nishigawara Uji City, 611 / JP | 03 /
Morimoto, Masamichi 10-10, Nakamiya 5-chome Asahi-ku Osaka City, 535 / JP | 04 /
Okahashi, Yoshikazu 4800-284, Kamimachi Ikoma City, 630-01 / JP | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110311.5 | 16.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | JP19860168347 | 17.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16834786 | JP19860170038 | 18.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17003886 | JP19860237352 | 06.10.1986 Original published format: JP 23735286 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0253397 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0253397 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253397 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/48, G06F15/62 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
G06V10/469 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G06V10/46 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/03] | G06K9/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/03] | Title | German: | Formerkennungsverfahren | [1993/39] | English: | Shape recognition method | [1993/39] | French: | Méthode de reconnaissance de formes | [1993/39] |
Former [1988/03] | Formerkennungsgerät | ||
Former [1988/03] | Shape recognition apparatus | ||
Former [1988/03] | Appareil de reconnaissance de formes | Examination procedure | 03.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4183013 (AGRAWALA ASHOK K [US], et al); | [A]GB2108306 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP0090395 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0131681 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 75 (P-266)(1512), 7 April 1984; JP-A-58 219683 |