EP0254231 - Optical heterodyne receiver, especially for PSK modulated light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pietzsch, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Waakirchner Strasse 34 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1988/04] | Application number, filing date | 87110409.7 | 17.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863624601 | 21.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624601 | DE19873722936 | 10.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3722936 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254231 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254231 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/06 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04B10/63 (EP,US);
H04B10/64 (EP,US);
H04L27/2272 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/04] | H04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | Optischer Überlagerungsempfänger für insbesondere phasensprungmoduliertes Licht | [1988/04] | English: | Optical heterodyne receiver, especially for PSK modulated light | [1988/04] | French: | Récepteur optique hétérodyne, en particulier pour lumière modulée par déplacement de phase | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.05.1991 | GR | 29.05.1991 | NL | 29.05.1991 | SE | 29.05.1991 | AT | 17.07.1991 | CH | 31.07.1991 | LI | 31.07.1991 | ES | 09.09.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 29.05.1991 | |
GR | 29.05.1991 | ||
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
AT | 17.07.1991 | ||
CH | 31.07.1991 | ||
LI | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1993/03] | BE | 29.05.1991 | |
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
AT | 17.07.1991 | ||
CH | 31.07.1991 | ||
LI | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/30] | BE | 29.05.1991 | |
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
CH | 31.07.1991 | ||
LI | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 29.05.1991 | |
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
CH | 31.07.1991 | ||
LI | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | NL | 29.05.1991 | |
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/51] | SE | 29.05.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0194786 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | [YD] - FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL FIBRE SENSORS, London, 26.-28. April 1983, Seiten 48-52, IEEE, Londen, GB; A. DANDRIDGE et al.: "Fiber optic interferometric sensor development at NRL" | [YD] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, Band LT-3, Nr. 5, Oktober 1985, Seiten 1110-1122, IEEE, New York, US; G.L. ABBAS et al.: "A dual-detector optical heterodyne receiver for local oscillator noise suppression" | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, Band 22, Nr. 1, 2. Januar 1986, Seiten 9-11, Stevenage, Herts, GB; A.W. DAVIS et al.: "Coherent optical receiver for 680 Mbit/s using phase diversity" | [A] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, Band LT-4, Nr. 2, Februar 1986, Seiten 182-195, IEEE, New York, US; L.G. KAZOVSKY: "Balanced phase-locked loops for optical homodyne receivers: performance analysis, design considerations, and laser linewidth requirements" | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, Band 21, Nr. 19, 12. September 1985, Seiten 867-868, Stevenage, Herts, GB; T.G. HODGKINSON et al.: "Demodulation of optical DPSK using in-phase and quadrature detection" |