EP0300067 - Process for depositing I-125 onto a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGovern, James Joseph RD 4, Box 220 Monroe, N.Y. 10950 / US | 02 /
Olynyk, Joseph Michael 4 Galloway Heights Warwick, N.Y. 10990 / US | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Kloter, Rudolf, et al Postfach 3255 Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1989/04] | Application number, filing date | 87110453.5 | 18.07.1987 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300067 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300067 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21G4/08 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
G21G4/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbringen von Jod-125 auf ein Substrat | [1989/04] | English: | Process for depositing I-125 onto a substrate | [1989/04] | French: | Procédé pour déposer de l'iode-125 sur un substrat | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1987 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0037678 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]GB1018723 (RONTGENAKTIEBOLAGET ISO X); | [A]FR2383501 (IBM [US]) |