EP0254259 - p-Aminophenol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanai, Kenichi 62-6, Yoshinaga Ootsu-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Goto, Kiyoto 57, Aza-Umagoe Akenokami Seto-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Kinji 7-8, Aza-Miyanohigashi Kitahama Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima-ken / JP | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110503.7 | 20.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | JP19860172431 | 21.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17243186 | JP19860213660 | 10.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21366086 | JP19870038595 | 20.02.1987 Original published format: JP 3859587 | JP19870094199 | 16.04.1987 Original published format: JP 9419987 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254259 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254259 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/20, C07D237/20, C07D239/42, C07D239/48, C07D231/38, C07D249/04, C07D249/08, C07D253/06, C07D263/48, C07D285/12, C07D333/36 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
C07D231/38 (EP,US);
C07D241/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D237/20 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,US);
C07D249/14 (EP,US);
C07D253/07 (EP,US);
C07D261/14 (EP,US);
C07D263/48 (EP,US);
C07D285/10 (EP,US);
C07D285/135 (EP,US);
C07D333/36 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | p-Aminophenol-Derivate | [1988/04] | English: | p-Aminophenol derivatives | [1988/04] | French: | Dérivés de p-aminophénols | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/04] | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD151404 ; | [A]GB1189188 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [A]EP0013143 (ICI AUSTRALIA LTD [AU]); | [A]EP0152596 (HEUMANN LUDWIG & CO GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0178035 (FISONS PLC [GB]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, 1982, pages 273-274, abstract no. 157395n, Columbus, Ohio, US; & DD-A-151 404 (F. FRANKE et al.) 21-10-1981, & DD151404 A 00000000 |