EP0300071 - Process for the separation and purification of organic substances from impurities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampe, Manfred Josef, Dr. Himbeerenweg 5 D-8011 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Heusch, Rudolf, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 85 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Heckenbach, Manfred, Dr. Kirschenweg 6 D-5024 Pulheim / DE | [1989/04] | Application number, filing date | 87110575.5 | 22.07.1987 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300071 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300071 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07B63/00, C12N9/00 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/0065 (EP);
C12N9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung und Reinigung organischer Substanzen von Begleitstoffen | [1989/04] | English: | Process for the separation and purification of organic substances from impurities | [1989/04] | French: | Procédé de séparation et de purification de substances organiques d'impuretés | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 26.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3579539 (BULLARD EDWARD M); | [AD]DE2639129 (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH) | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, Band 388, 1987, Seiten 295-305, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; G. JOHANSSON et al.: "Effects of organic solvents on the partitioning of enzymes in aqueous two-phase systems" |