EP0257302 - Method of producing amorphous layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states DORNIER GMBH Postfach 1420 D-88004 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states DORNIER SYSTEM GmbH Postfach 1360 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinwandel, Jürgen, Dr. Römerweg 1 D-7778 Markdorf / DE | 02 /
Hauser, Manfred, Prof. Dr. Moosweg 1 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
Höschele, Jörg Zeppelinstrasse 28 D-7000 Stuttgart / DE | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH LHG 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110585.4 | 22.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | DE19863628443 | 21.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3628443 | [1988/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257302 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257302 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257302 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, C23C16/44 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
C23C16/452 (EP,US);
C23C16/483 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/09] | H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung amorpher Schichten | [1988/09] | English: | Method of producing amorphous layers | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de couches amorphes | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.1992 | 31.07.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.07.1994 | [1995/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59189684 ; | [X]JP59200753 ; | [A]JP6126772 ; | [X]DE3416470 (SEMICONDUCTOR RES FOUND [JP]); | [A]DE2631881 (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 49 (E-300)[1772], 2. März 1985; & JP-A-59 189 684 (TOYO BOSEKI K.K.) 27-10-1984, & JP59189684 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 66 (C-271)[1789], 26. März 1985; & JP-A-59 200 753 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 14-11-1984, & JP59200753 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 178 (C-355)[2234], 21. Juni 1986; & JP-A-61 26 772 (CANON INC.) 06-02-1986, & JP6126772 A 00000000 | [A] - FIFTH E.C. PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE, Athens, 17. - 21. Oktober 1983, Seiten 778-782, D. Reidel Publishing Co., Dordrecht, NL; R. MARTINS et al.: "Analysis of a new production technique for amorphous silicon solar cells" |