EP0255662 - Sealing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haberberger, Vitus, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hauptstrasse 20 D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | [1988/06] | Application number, filing date | 87110636.5 | 22.07.1987 | [1988/06] | Priority number, date | DE19863626383 | 04.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3626383 | [1988/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255662 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255662 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255662 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/36, F16J15/34 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
F16J15/36 (EP,US);
F27B7/24 (EP,US);
Y10S277/903 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/06] | F16J15/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/06] | Title | German: | Dichtung | [1988/06] | English: | Sealing | [1988/06] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité | [1988/06] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB284134 (KRUPP FRIED GRUSONWERK AG); | [X]US2354478 (REINHARDT ROBERT C, et al); | [A]FR1056419 (SHELL REFINING & MARKETING CO); | [A]DE937324 (WERNERT KARL); | [A]DE1450277 (BORG WARNER) |