EP0255048 - Portable radio telephone having power saver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Yoshihiko c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Babano, Sotoaki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87110683.7 | 23.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | JP19860174743 | 26.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17474386 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255048 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255048 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255048 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H04Q7/04, H04M1/72 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
H04W52/0241 (EP,US);
H04M19/00 (KR);
H04B1/16 (KR);
H04M1/73 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/05] | Title | German: | Tragbares Funktelefon mit Energiespareinrichtung | [1993/39] | English: | Portable radio telephone having power saver | [1988/05] | French: | Radio-téléphone portable avec économiseur d'énergie | [1988/05] |
Former [1988/05] | Tragbares Funktelefon mit Energiespargerät | Examination procedure | 23.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.09.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/02] | FR | 18.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6016732 ; | [X]GB1111006 (PYE LTD); | [X]US4086537 (ASAKAWA SHIGERU, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 181 (E-331)[1904], 26th July 1985; & JP-A³60 52 133 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 25-03-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 131 (E-319)[1854], 6th June 1985; & JP-A-60 16 732 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 28-01-1985, & JP6016732 A 00000000 |