EP0255904 - Process for the preparation of dihydrocyclocitral [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/07] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes Case Postale 239 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmons, Dana Philip, Dr. 7, rue Guye CH-1203 Geneve / CH | [1988/07] | Representative(s) | Salvadori, Giuseppe c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/07] | Salvadori, Giuseppe, Dr. c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 87110800.7 | 25.07.1987 | [1988/07] | Priority number, date | CH19860003154 | 06.08.1986 Original published format: CH 315486 | [1988/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255904 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255904 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255904 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/32, C07C45/54 | [1988/07] | CPC: |
C07C47/32 (EP,US);
C07C45/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/54, C07C47/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dihydrocyclocitral | [1988/07] | English: | Process for the preparation of dihydrocyclocitral | [1988/07] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de dihydrocyclocitral | [1988/07] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 13.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1204407 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) |