EP0258804 - Process for preparing vinylphosphonic acid dichloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegel, Herbert, Dr. Am alten Birnbaum 10a D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Erwin, Dr. Vorderheide 1 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Berger, Harald, Dr. Johann-Strauss-Strasse 45 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1988/10] | Application number, filing date | 87112379.0 | 26.08.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DE19863629578 | 30.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3629578 | [1988/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258804 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258804 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258804 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/42 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
C07F9/42 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vinylphosphonsäuredichlorid | [1988/10] | English: | Process for preparing vinylphosphonic acid dichloride | [1988/10] | French: | Procédé pour préparer le dichlorure d'acide vinylphosphonique | [1988/10] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0047460 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AD]US4213922 (MAIER LUDWIG [CH]) | Examination | DE1569945 | FR2141962 |