EP0258827 - A method for connecting a plastic pipe end to a plastic welding sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TARCO ENERGI A/S Erritso Mollebanke 10 DK-7000 Fredericia / DK | [1992/19] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states TARCO A/S Slipshavnsvej 12 DK-5800 Nyborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Christian Plantagevej 44 DK-7000 Fredericia / DK | 02 /
Munck, Michael Fredericiavej 16 DK-7000 Fredericia / DK | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87112489.7 | 27.08.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DK19860004106 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: DK 410686 | [1988/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0258827 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258827 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/02, B29C65/22 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
F16L59/20 (EP);
B29C44/1295 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/344 (EP);
B29C65/3468 (EP);
B29C65/3476 (EP);
B29C65/72 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/53241 (EP);
B29C66/72321 (EP);
B29C66/727 (EP);
B29C66/91313 (EP);
B29C66/91315 (EP);
B29C66/91411 (EP);
B29C66/91443 (EP);
B29C66/91643 (EP);
B29C66/91653 (EP);
B29C66/91655 (EP);
B29C66/91951 (EP);
B29C66/96 (EP);
F16L47/03 (EP);
B29C65/3452 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/5229 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/73161 (EP);
B29C66/832 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/94 (EP);
B29C66/9592 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29K2023/0691 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0691 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbindung eines Kunststoffrohrendes mit einer schweissbaren Kunststoffhülse | [1988/10] | English: | A method for connecting a plastic pipe end to a plastic welding sleeve | [1988/10] | French: | Méthode pour assemblage d'un bout de tuyau plastique avec un manchon plastique soudable | [1988/10] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 23.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Request for further processing for: | 29.12.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.1992 | BE | 17.06.1992 | CH | 17.06.1992 | FR | 17.06.1992 | GR | 17.06.1992 | LI | 17.06.1992 | NL | 17.06.1992 | LU | 31.08.1992 | ES | 28.09.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 17.06.1992 | |
BE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
GR | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
ES | 28.09.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.06.1992 | |
BE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
GR | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 17.06.1992 | |
BE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/22] | AT | 17.06.1992 | |
BE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 17.06.1992 | |
BE | 17.06.1992 | ||
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | US3506519 [ ] (BLUMENKRANZ JAMES J); | DE1615092 [ ] (ATLANTIC RES CORP); | CH532996 [ ] (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | AT361748B [ ] (STURM WERNER [CH]); | EP0035750 [ ] (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | FR2516439 [ ] (ARMOSIG [FR]); | EP0171450 [ ] (OESTERR SALEN KUNSTSTOFFWERK [AT]) |