EP0258905 - Process and device for lining and securing an underground cavern made by using a driving shield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRABAG BAU - AG Siegburger Strasse 241 50679 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states STRABAG BAU - AG Siegburger Strasse 241 Postfach 211120 D-50535 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faltin, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Heideweg 11 D-5064 Rösrath-Forsbach / DE | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Hennicke, Albrecht, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 D-50501 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87112927.6 | 04.09.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | DE19863630240 | 05.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3630240 | [1988/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0258905 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E21D9/06 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
E21D11/10 (EP);
E21D9/001 (EP);
E21D9/0873 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auskleiden und Sichern eines im Schildvortrieb ausgefahrenen, unterirdischen Hohlraumes | [1988/10] | English: | Process and device for lining and securing an underground cavern made by using a driving shield | [1988/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour revêtir et protéger une cavité souterraine construite en utilisant un bouclier | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 25.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 03.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/42] | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0122540 ; | [A]DE2108591 ; | [A]DE2653954 ; | [A]GB2169020 ; | [A]US3889480 |