EP0259816 - Method for bonding semiconductor laser element and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Akihiro 5-19, Nakamiya-Nishinocho Hirakata City, 573 / JP | 02 /
Makino, Yutaka 18 26, Eirakuso 2-come Toyonaka City, 560 / JP | 03 /
Kaino, Shinji 41-13, Hoshigaoka 2-chome Hirakata City, 573 / JP | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113055.5 | 07.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | JP19860212283 | 09.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21228386 | [1988/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0259816 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0259816 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0259816 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/025 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
H01S5/02326 (EP,US);
H05K3/00 (KR);
H01S3/02 (KR);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01S5/02355 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1988/11] | H01S3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1988/11] | Title | German: | Methode und Apparat zum Befestigen eines Halbleiterlaserelementes | [1988/11] | English: | Method for bonding semiconductor laser element and apparatus therefor | [1988/11] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de fixation d'un élément laser à semi-conducteur | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60242691 ; | [A]US4389557 (DEVENYI TIBOR F [CA], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 104 (E-397)[2161], 19th April 1986; & JP-A-60 242 691 (TATEISHI DENKI K.K.) 02-12-1985, & JP60242691 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 18, no. 14, July 1982, pages 629-631, London, GB; "Capillary bonded components for injection laser transmitter modules" |